Bannatyne, Robert Mccay (CPSO#: 20950)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 302 780 Gordon Street Thunder Bay, ON P7E 6S1
Date Received: 02 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 16 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2015