Banner, Harrison Matthew (CPSO#: 100420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Hlth Sci Centre
1280 Main Street West
4th Floor
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76250
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARRISON MATTHEW BANNER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BANNER is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. BANNER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BANNER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BANNER shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BANNER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BANNER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018