Bannister, Leslie Robert (CPSO#: 21395)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L Bannister Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 221 Brant Avenue Brantford, ON N3T 3J2
Instructions: Please contact Dr. Adam Norris for medical record requests
Date Received: 23 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015