Bannister, Susan Louise (CPSO#: 72077)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 1998 to 06 Mar 1998
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008