Bannon, Diane Marie (CPSO#: 103512)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dilico Anishinabek Family Care
200 Anemki Place
Fort William First Nation, Ontario
P7J 1L6
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone: (807) 626-5200
Fax: 807 623-0536
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE MARIE BANNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANNON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2016