Bansal, Praveen (CPSO#: 60786)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Heart Lake Medical Centre
Suite 101
10425 Kennedy Road North
Brampton ON  L6Z 0A4
Phone: (905) 846-7611
Fax: (905) 846-7753
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Praveen Bansal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bansal ( CPSO# 60786 )

Business Address:
Heart Lake Village Medical Centre
101 - 10425 Kennedy Road North
Brampton ON  L6Z 0A4
Phone Number: (905) 846-7611

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRAVEEN BANSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANSAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1990