Banta, Gregory Allen (CPSO#: 59660)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bank Medical Centre
1935 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 8A3
Phone: (613) 521-2391 Ext. 111
Fax: (613) 521-5443
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of National Defence
101 Colonel By Drive
Carling Campus, Building 9S.1
Dir. of Force Health Protection
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Canada
Phone: (613) 901-9367
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY ALLEN BANTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2014