Banwell, Brian Robert (CPSO#: 68123)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Windsor Regional Hospital-Ouellette
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: 519 973 4411 Ext. 32208
Fax: 519 737 9546
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Interventional Epidural Clinic
6525 Malden Rd.
Suite # 2
LaSalle
La Salle ON  N9H 1T5
Canada
Phone: 519 737 9233
Fax: 519 737 9546
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN ROBERT BANWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1999