Bar-Zemer-Magen, Shulamit (CPSO#: 87539)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Hadassah Medical School, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 23 Oct 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Care of the Elderly

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008