Barabtarlo, Jack (CPSO#: 33416)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 505
15 Wertheim Court
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3H7
Phone: (905) 882-7828
Fax: (905) 882-9248
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 200
637 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2R2
Canada
Phone: (905) 836-1958
Fax: (905) 836-1402
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACK BARABTARLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARABTARLO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2003
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2003
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 31 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2004

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Sep 2003
Summary:

 On September 3, 2003 the Discipline Committee found Dr. Barabtarlo to have committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he had been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his 
 suitability to practise.

On September 4, 2003, the Discipline Committee ordered the 
 following:

1)	Dr. Jack Barabtarlo attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the 
 	reprimand to be recorded on the register.
2)	The registrar suspend Dr. Barabtarlo(s certificate 
 of registration for a period of three (3) 	months, effective on a date to be fixed by the 
 Registrar, with the period of suspension to 	commence no later than October 31, 2003.
3)	The 
 Registrar impose a term, condition and limitation on Dr. Barabtarlo(s cetificate of 	registration 
 that Dr. Barabtarlo refrain from directly billing OHIP for a period of six (6) 	consectutive 
 months commencing from the date the suspension of Dr. Barabtarlo comes 	into force.		
4)	Dr. 
 Barabtarlo pay costs to the College in the amoung of $2500.00 by October 31, 2003.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 03, 2003