Barakat, Meredith Elaine (CPSO#: 91111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
6 Thompson Crescent
Erin ON  N0B 1T0
Phone: (519) 833-9396
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEREDITH ELAINE BARAKAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARAKAT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012