Barake, Walid Maged (CPSO#: 96052)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Beirut Arab University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014