Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Baran, Gregory Paul (CPSO#: 63696)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
902 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 1W9
Phone: (613) 546-2321
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Baran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Baran ( CPSO# 63696 )

Business Address:
902 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 1W9
Phone Number: (613) 546-7878

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY PAUL BARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2003

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 18, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.


See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)