Baranchuk, Adrian Marco (CPSO#: 80175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Jun 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Kingston General Hospital
FAPC 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3377
Fax: (613) 548-1387
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrian Baranchuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Baranchuk ( CPSO# 80175 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
FAPC 3, Room 310
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 08 Sep 2003 to 17 Nov 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 18 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Apr 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Adrian Marco Baranchuk may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Queen's  University, in which Dr. Baranchuk holds an appointment at
                        the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirement of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires when Dr. Baranchuk
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.