Baranick, Peter Paul (CPSO#: 31037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Baranick-Robertson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Robertson ( CPSO# 31308 )
Dr. P. Baranick ( CPSO# 31037 )

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Clinic Head Office
Medical Affairs
2575A Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 7B3
Phone Number: (613) 726-3558

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8309

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Mar 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Jun 2017
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Jun 2017
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 12 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from 1:30 p.m., June 12, 2017, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Peter Paul Baranick:

            (a)   Dr. Baranick shall, within six (6) months of the end of the period of the
                  suspension, complete a comprehensive Continuing Medical Education (CME)
                  program acceptable to the College focusing on the areas of concern raised
                  in the report of the College assessor dated March 30, 2016;
            (b)   Dr. Baranick shall limit his practice to no more than six (6) patients
                  per hour;
                  Clinical Supervision
            (c)   Within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order, Dr. Baranick shall
                  obtain a clinical supervisor acceptable to the College, who will
                  supervise Dr. Baranick for a period of six (6) months, and who will sign
                  an undertaking in the form attached hereto as Schedule "A" (the "Clinical
                  Supervisor");
            (d)   The Clinical Supervision shall be at a moderate level for six (6) months,
                  commencing on the date following the expiry of the suspension of Dr.
                  Baranick's certificate of registration.  The Clinical Supervisor will
                  meet with Dr. Baranick bi-weekly and review a minimum of ten (10) of Dr.
                  Baranick's patient charts, discuss  Dr. Baranick's patient care,
                  treatment plan and follow-up, identify any concerns regarding the care,
                  treatment plan and follow-up and make recommendations for improvement; 
            (e)   Within three (3) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision,
                  Dr. Baranick will submit to a reassessment of his practice (the
                  "Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the
                  "Assessor(s)").  The Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                  observation of Dr. Baranick's care, interviews with colleagues and
                  co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary
                  by the College.  Dr. Baranick shall abide by all recommendations made by
                  the Assessor(s), and the results of the Reassessment will be reported to
                  the College and may form the basis of further action by the College;
            (f)   Dr. Baranick shall cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision and
                  abide by all recommendations of his Clinical Supervisor(s) with respect
                  to practice improvements and education;
            (g)   Dr. Baranick shall consent to the disclosure by the Clinical Supervisor
                  to the College, and by the College to his Clinical Supervisor, of all
                  information the Clinical Supervisor or the College deems necessary or
                  desirable in order to fulfill the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking and
                  to monitor Dr. Baranick's compliance with this Order.  This shall
                  include, without limitation, providing the Clinical Supervisor with any
                  reports of any assessments of Dr. Baranick's practice in the College's
                  possession; 
            (h)   If a Clinical Supervisor who has given an undertaking in Schedule "A" to
                  this Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr.
                  Baranick shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same,
                  obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly
                  qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is
                  delivered to the College within that time;
            (i)   If Dr. Baranick is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor in accordance
                  with paragraphs 4(b) or 4(g) of this Order, he shall cease practising
                  medicine until such time as he has done so, and the fact that he has will
                  constitute a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of
                  registration until that time; 
            (j)   Dr. Baranick shall co-operate with unannounced inspections and shall
                  consent to the monitoring of his OHIP billings of his Practice by a
                  College representative(s), for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing
                  his compliance with the terms of this Order;
            (k)   Dr. Baranick shall inform the College of each and every location that he
                  practises or has privileges, including, but not limited to, hospital(s),
                  clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction within fifteen (15) days of
                  this Order, and shall inform the College of any and all new Practice
                  Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                  location; and
            (l)   Dr. Baranick shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with
                  implementing the terms of this Order.


            As from September 23, 2015, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Peter Paul Baranick in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Baranick has provided to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

            Dr. Baranick is prohibited from prescribing the following drugs, substances and
            preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as amended from time to
            time, and summarized as follows:

                  (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                        the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                        under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); 
                  (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                        or
                  (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);        
            and as amended from time to time.

            Dr. Baranick shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his
            Practice Locations, which states as follows: "Dr. Baranick must not prescribe
            Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and
            Other Targeted Substances, and/or all other Monitored Drugs. Further
            information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
            website at www.cpso.on.ca". The sign shall be translated into any language(s)
            in which Dr. Baranick provides services, posted in the waiting rooms of all his
            Practice Locations, in a clearly visible location. 

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Jun 2017
Summary:

On June 12, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Baranick committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession. 
  
Dr. Baranick is a family physician practising at Appletree Medical walk-in Clinics in Ottawa. He 
obtained his medical degree from the University of Ottawa in 1973 and has held an independent 
practice certificate with this College from 1979 to 1982 and from 1989 to present. 
 
2012 Practice Re-Assessment  
 
On February 15, 2010, Dr. Baranick signed an Undertaking with the College to practice under 
Clinical Supervision, to successfully complete Medical Record-Keeping and Ethics courses, and 
to undergo a re-inspection of his practice.  
 
The College retained an independent medical expert to conduct the re-assessment of Dr. 
Baranick’s practice pursuant to the 2010 Undertaking. The medical expert indicated that 
although Dr. Baranick is an experienced clinician who has worked in primary patient care for 
most of his career, he has recently made the transition from working in the Emergency 
Department of a hospital to seeing unscheduled patients in a number of ambulatory clinics.  
 
The medical expert reported that Dr. Baranick admitted that he sees too many patients during his 
shifts, and this may be one factor that has resulted in poor notations on the charts of his patients. 
The medical expert noted that Dr. Baranick recently took one of the College’s courses on record-
keeping and should be familiar with the College’s guidelines. In addition, the medical expert was 
surprised that Dr. Baranick did not seem familiar with “SOAP” format advocated by the College, 
and that he rarely uses that format to help him structure his patient assessments.   
 
The medical expert concluded that Dr. Baranick fails to meet the standard of practice of a 
competent practitioner in his care of patients. Specifically, he found that beyond charting issues: 
 
-  Dr. Baranick's care displays a lack of medical knowledge of clinical conditions commonly 
   seen in the walk-in setting, including upper respiratory tract infections, eye and ear problems, 
   genito-urinary conditions and asthma. This hampers Dr. Baranick’s abilities to appropriately 
   assess patients and to effectively manage their problems.  
-  Dr.Baranick’s assessment of ocular problems exemplifies that in some instances Dr. 
   Baranick’s care displays a lack of skill.  
-  Dr. Baranick’s care displays a lack of judgment in management of patients requesting repeats 
   of prescription drugs, with the potential to expose such patients to harm. 
 
The medical expert recommended that: 
 
-  Dr. Baranick make efforts to limit the number of patients seen during his shifts, that he make 
   efforts to identify areas of clinical weakness in addition to those identified during the medical 
   expert’s reassessment process, and that he take steps to increase his medical knowledge. 
-  Dr. Baranick’s practice be supervised by a clinician whose practice is more closely aligned 
   with that of Dr. Baranick and that his practice be subsequently reassessed. 
       
2013 Practice Assessment  
 
On April 17, 2013 the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee considered the expert’s 
report and directed another Undertaking for Dr. Baranick to restrict his practice to no more than 
6 patients per hour, to complete the Comprehensive Family Practice Review (CFPR) course, to 
practice under supervision of a Clinical Supervisor, and to undergo a comprehensive practice 
reassessment.   
       
An independent medical expert who conducted the comprehensive practice assessment opined 
that although Dr. Baranick is an experienced physician who has undergone reassessment and 
remediation of his practice in previous years, he still fails to meet the standard of practice of the 
profession in his record keeping due to legibility concerns and in not providing enough detail 
about some presenting complaints. Also, Dr. Baranick does not meet the standard of practice of 
the profession in assessing and managing community acquired infections, infant care, and 
chronic illness, such as arthritis, diabetes, and hypercholesterolemia. The medical expert 
concluded that Dr. Baranick demonstrates a lack of knowledge, skill, and judgment in these areas 
which have a potential to cause harm. 
 
On June 12, 2017, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-  The Registrar suspend Dr. Baranick’s certificate of registration for a period of two (2) months 
   effective immediately. 
-  The Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Baranick’s 
   certificate of registration: 
   (a)   Dr. Baranick shall, within six (6) months of the end of the period of the suspension, 
         complete a comprehensive Continuing Medical Education (CME) program acceptable 
         to the College focusing on the areas of concern raised in the report of the College 
         assessor dated March 30, 2016; 
   (b)   Dr. Baranick shall limit his practice to no more than six (6) patients per hour; 
   Clinical Supervision 
   (c)   Within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order, Dr. Baranick shall obtain a clinical 
         supervisor acceptable to the College, who will supervise Dr. Baranick for a period of 
         six (6) months, and who will sign an undertaking in the form attached to this Order as 
         Appendix A (“Clinical Supervisor”); 
   (d)   The Clinical Supervision shall be at a moderate level for six (6) months, commencing 
         on the date following the expiry of the suspension of Dr. Baranick’s certificate of 
         registration.  The Clinical Supervisor will meet with Dr. Baranick bi-weekly and 
         review a minimum of ten (10) of Dr. Baranick’s patient charts, discuss  Dr. 
         Baranick’s patient care, treatment plan and follow-up, identify any concerns 
         regarding the care, treatment plan and follow-up and make recommendations for 
         improvement;  
   (e)   Within three (3) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision, Dr. 
         Baranick will submit to a reassessment of his practice (the “Reassessment”) by an 
         assessor or assessors selected by the College (the “Assessor(s)”).  The Reassessment 
         may include a chart review, direct observation of Dr. Baranick’s care, interviews with 
         colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed 
         necessary by the College.  Dr. Baranick shall abide by all recommendations made by 
            the Assessor(s), and the results of the Reassessment will be reported to the College 
            and may form the basis of further action by the College; 
      (f)   Dr. Baranick shall cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision and abide by all 
            recommendations of his Clinical Supervisor(s) with respect to practice improvements 
            and education; 
      (g)   Dr. Baranick shall consent to the disclosure by the Clinical Supervisor to the College, 
            and by the College to his Clinical Supervisor, of all information the Clinical 
            Supervisor or the College deems necessary or desirable in order to fulfill the Clinical 
            Supervisor’s undertaking and to monitor Dr. Baranick’s compliance with this Order.  
            This shall include, without limitation, providing the Clinical Supervisor with any 
            reports of any assessments of Dr. Baranick’s practice in the College’s possession;  
      (h)   If a Clinical Supervisor who has given an undertaking in Schedule “A” to this Order 
            is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr. Baranick shall, within 
            twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the 
            same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and 
            ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time; 
      (i)   If Dr. Baranick is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor in accordance with 
            paragraphs 4(b) or 4(g) of this Order, he shall cease practising medicine until such 
            time as he has done so, and the fact that he has will constitute a term, condition or 
            limitation on his certificate of registration until that time;  
      (j)   Dr. Baranick shall co-operate with unannounced inspections and shall consent to the 
            monitoring of his OHIP billings of his Practice by a College representative(s), for the 
            purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order; 
      (k)   Dr. Baranick shall inform the College of each and every location that he practises or 
            has privileges, including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any 
            jurisdiction within fifteen (15) days of this Order, and shall inform the College of any 
            and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at 
            that location; and 
      (l)   Dr. Baranick shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing 
            the terms of this Order. 
-  Dr. Baranick attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Baranick pay to the College costs in the amount of $5,500.00, within thirty (30) days of the 
   date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): June 12, 2017

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)