Baraniecki, Robert Roch (CPSO#: 95091)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: (905) 338-4149
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

51 Mountainash Road
Suite 8
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Baraniecki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mullen ( CPSO# 100777)
Dr. R. Baraniecki ( CPSO# 95091 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT ROCH BARANIECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARANIECKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013