Barasi, Mohamed A (CPSO#: 85745)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2006 to 12 Dec 2006
PEAP - Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 13 Dec 2006 to 13 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 14 Dec 2007 to 13 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 14 Dec 2008 to 13 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 14 Dec 2009 to 13 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 14 Dec 2010 to 13 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013