Barbeau, Gerald (CPSO#: 71046)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jan 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Laval University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2001