Barber, Albert Shannon (CPSO#: 22653)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Sep 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2004