Barber, Neil Kevin (CPSO#: 27896)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Queen's Family Health Team, 220 Bagot Street, Kingston, ON K7L 5E9
Date Received: 01 Jun 2015


Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 25 Feb 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015