Barbera, Joseph (CPSO#: 71215)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Youthdale Child and Adolescent
Sleep Centre
227 Victoria St Lower Level 2
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone: (416) 703-0505
Fax: (416) 703-0507
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Sleep and Altertness Clinic
790 Bay Street, Suite #800
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: (647) 479-2156 Ext. 201
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

OATC Brampton
14 Nelson St, Units A and B
Brampton ON  L6X 1B7
Canada
Phone: (905) 450-6679
Fax: (905) 450-7741
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

OATC Danforth
1154 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON  M4J 1M3
Canada
Phone: (647) 748-8780
Fax: (647) 748-8783
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Barbera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Barbera ( CPSO# 71215 )

Business Address:
The Youthdale Child and Adolescent Sleep Centre
227 Victoria Street
Lower Level 2
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone Number: (416) 703-0505

Business Address:
Units A + B
14 Nelson Street
Brampton ON  L6X 1B7
Phone Number: (905) 450-7741

Business Address:
OATC Danforth
1154 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1M3

Business Address:
The Toronto Sleep Institute
208 - 390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 709-9696

Business Address:
The Sleep & Alertness Clinic
790 Bay Street
Suite 950
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH BARBERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARBERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002