Barchan, Olexander (CPSO#: 78958)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Apr 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:National Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
O K Medical Centre
1278 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 1S3
Phone: (416) 848-9795
Fax: (416) 521-7216
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barchan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 20 2009


Corporation Name: Barchan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Barchan ( CPSO# 78958 )

Business Address:
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8

Business Address:
1896 Bough Beeches Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L4W 2J7

Business Address:
O K Medical Centre
1278 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M8Z 1S3
Phone Number: (416) 848-9795

Business Address:
400 - 123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 597-0997

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Hawaii
USA - North Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLEXANDER BARCHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARCHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2003