Bard, Timothy David (CPSO#: 72419)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 204
216 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1S8
Phone: (519) 428-9992
Fax: (519) 428-0823
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy Bard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bard ( CPSO# 72419 )

Business Address:
Unit 204
216 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1S8
Phone Number: (519) 428-9992

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY DAVID BARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002