Bardana, Davide Domenico (CPSO#: 68252)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Calgary, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Surgery
76 Stuart Street, Watkins 3
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 6333
Fax: (613) 548-1336
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Davide Bardana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 11 2007


Corporation Name: Davide Bardana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bardana ( CPSO# 68252 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Base Hospital
CFB Kingston
33 CF Health Services Centre
Kingston ON  K7K 7B4
Phone Number: (613) 541-5010

Business Address:
Lennox & Addington County General
Hosptial
3 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Surgery
76 Stuart Street
Nickle 3
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666


Corporation Name: Borschneck Yach Bardana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yach ( CPSO# 66809 )
Dr. D. Bardana ( CPSO# 68252 )
Dr. D. Borschneck ( CPSO# 64068 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3
Room 3-3-119
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVIDE DOMENICO BARDANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARDANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2002