Bardell, Trevor (CPSO#: 79164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
General Surgery and Endoscopy
114 St Paul Street
Belleville ON  K8N 0E1
Phone: (613) 967-7873
Fax: (613) 967-0941
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Trevor Bardell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bardell ( CPSO# 79164 )

Business Address:
114 St. Paul Street
Belleville ON  K8N 0E1
Phone Number: (613) 967-7873

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TREVOR BARDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARDELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008