Barfoot, Alison Heather (CPSO#: 88489)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: Becks, Alison Heather (used until: 06 Jul 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: (519) 370-4054
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alison Barfoot Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Barfoot ( CPSO# 88489 )

Business Address:
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISON HEATHER BARFOOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARFOOT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2010