Baribeau, Danielle Andrea (CPSO#: 98101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction and Mental
Health, Post Graduate Education
250 College Street
Ste 841
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: 415-535-8501
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE ANDREA BARIBEAU shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BARIBEAU is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BARIBEAU shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BARIBEAU is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BARIBEAU shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BARIBEAU is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BARIBEAU no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018