Baribeau, Yvon (CPSO#: 60687)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 26 Oct 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 May 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993