Bariciak, Mark David (CPSO#: 65066)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1-677 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 5A1
Phone: (705) 949-5182
Fax: (705) 251-9969
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amimi Bariciak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Amimi ( CPSO# 65064 )
Dr. M. Bariciak ( CPSO# 65066 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
677 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 5A1
Phone Number: (705) 942-5151

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK DAVID BARICIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARICIAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993