Barkin, Jack (CPSO#: 29978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 404
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone: (416) 256-2737
Fax: (416) 256-9098
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: (416) 243-4547
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

123 Edward Street
suite 1401
Toronto ON  M5G1E2
Canada
Phone: 4169799000 Ext. 2
Fax: 4169244993
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jack Barkin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Barkin ( CPSO# 29978 )

Business Address:
1401 - 123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 924-9760

Business Address:
Suite 404
960 Lawrenece Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone Number: (416) 256-2737

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACK BARKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARKIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1978