Barks, John Donald Edward (CPSO#: 50115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DONALD EDWARD BARKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARKS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1987