Barlis, Cara Jeanette (CPSO#: 57199)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: Murphy, Cara Jeanette (used until: 19 Jun 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Sep 1997