Barlow, Amanda Jane (CPSO#: 72989)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Adelaide, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Nov 2008