Barlow, Charles Robert (CPSO#: 30588)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2001