Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Barlow, Joseph Ross (CPSO#: 67255)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH ROSS BARLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARLOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1998