Barnard, Maja (CPSO#: 68024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
4 S E 111
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6455
Fax: (416) 756-4294
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAJA BARNARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARNARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999