Barnes, Patrick Theophilus (CPSO#: 24786)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 May 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 May 2012

Concerns

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: July 15, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Patrick Theophilus Barnes to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Services Department):

I, Dr. Patrick Theophilus Barnes:


(2) Acknowledge that I was the subject of an investigation by the College regarding whether I have practiced outside of the practice restrictions on my certificate of registration and, thereby, breached my Undertaking to the College, dated September 17, 2008 (the “Investigation”).
(3) Acknowledge that there was no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Investigation.
(4) Hereby resign from the College effective May 15, 2012 (the “Effective Date”).
(5)Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
(6) Agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I have applied for registration as a physician in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the Investigation it terminated as a result of this Undertaking and/or to proceed with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.
(9) Undertake to the College that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the Effective Date.
(11) Acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the terms and conditions in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(12) Consent to this Undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.