Barnett, Aaron Douglas Earl (CPSO#: 77866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
40 O'Brien Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5S3
Phone: (705) 327-3330
Fax: (705) 327-7675
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron Barnett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Barnett ( CPSO# 77866 )

Business Address:
Emergency Room
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
40 O'Brien Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5S3
Phone Number: (705) 327-3330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jul 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON DOUGLAS EARL BARNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARNETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Sep 2002 to 02 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Sep 2003 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2005