Barnett Tapia, Carolina (CPSO#: 94087)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2015

Expiry Date:  14 Sep 2022

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Pontificia Universidad Católica de Chile, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Neurology
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 4163404800 Ext. 3957
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 15 Sep 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Carolina Barnett Tapia may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Neurology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Barnett
                        Tapia holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Barnett Tapia  no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Barnett Tapia's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Barnett Tapia's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 15, 2015.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on September 14, 2022.