Barnett, William Howard (CPSO#: 32265)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medpoint Health Care Centre
London ON  N6A3N7
Phone: 519-432-1919
Fax: 519-432-9529
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Alexandra Hospital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Canada
Phone: (519) 485-1700
Fax: (519) 485-9606
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Tillsonburg District Memorial Hosp.
167 Rolph St
TILLSONBURG ON
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3X9
Canada
Phone: (519) 482-3611
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Barnett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Barnett ( CPSO# 32265 )

Business Address:
AIM Health Group
458 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E5
Phone Number: (519) 432-1521

Business Address:
Alexandra Hospital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 485-1700

Business Address:
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3X9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM HOWARD BARNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARNETT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1981