Barnwell, Donna Marie (CPSO#: 67031)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite C08
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone: (416) 431-2797
Fax: (416) 431-2891
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donna Barnwell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Barnwell ( CPSO# 67031 )

Business Address:
Suite C08
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 431-2875

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA MARIE BARNWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARNWELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998