Baron, Murray (CPSO#: 31619)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2007