Baron, Todd Huntley (CPSO#: 81978)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Florida, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2008