Barozzino, Antonio (CPSO#: 60727)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Health Centre
Pediatrics Clinic
2nd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barozzino Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Barozzino ( CPSO# 60727 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Health Centre
Pediatrics Clinic
2nd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3655

Business Address:
40 Glencairn Avenue
Toronto ON  M4R 1M5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONIO BAROZZINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAROZZINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1990