Barr, Margaret Nina (CPSO#: 18921)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Feb 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994