Barr, Robert Murray (CPSO#: 19403)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 18 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011