Barr, Scott Kenneth Murray (CPSO#: 59799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Barr Plastic Surgery / NOSC
205 Douglas Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1E9
Phone: (705) 523-4900
Fax: (705) 523-4720
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

SKIN MediSpa
205 Douglas Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1E9
Canada
Phone: (705) 673-7546
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Barr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Barr ( CPSO# 59799 )

Business Address:
205 Douglas Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1E9
Phone Number: (705) 523-4900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT KENNETH MURRAY BARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1989