Barra, Lillian De Jesus Jeremias (CPSO#: 82437)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
Rm D2-160
268 Grosvenor St.
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-5986
Fax: (519) 646-6072
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Barra ( CPSO# 82437 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Rm D2-160
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-5986

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 31 Jan 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILLIAN DE JESUS JEREMIAS BARRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2010