Barrenechea, Ana Maria (CPSO#: 42378)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Chile, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: ambarrenec@gmail.com
Date Received: 24 Jul 2017


Instructions: Until October 2017, patients may submit written requests for medical records to her previous practice address: Suite 609 600 Sherbourne Street Toronto ON M4X 1W4
Date Received: 24 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2017