Barrera Martinez, Juan Carlos (CPSO#: 72009)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad Autonoma De Nuevo Leon, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Nov 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 20 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 1998